BROMPTON ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Brompton Association is a civic amenity society. Its objectives are: To promote high standards of planning and architecture in or affecting the area of benefit. To educate the public in the geography, history, natural history and architecture of the area of benefit. To secure the preservation, protection, development and improvement of features of historic or public interest in the area of ben
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 11 February 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOPHIE CLODAGH MARY BLAIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter Geoffrey Arbuthnot | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN MARK HINDLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OLIVIA GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOANNA MARGARET GOODWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORD HUGH DETMAR RATHCAVEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BOB MABON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE WHEWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.03k | £13.06k | £3.69k | £10.93k | £16.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.10k | £19.69k | £10.11k | £7.15k | £47.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2024 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND BYE-LAWS ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 1974 AS AMENDED 14 JUNE 1984
Charitable objects
A. TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY,HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE NORTHERN SECTION OF THE THURLOE ESTATE AND SMITH'S CHARITY ESTATE CONSERVATION AREA AND CERTAIN AREAS OF BROMPTON AND KNIGHTSBRIDGE.B. TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE AFFECTING THE AREA.C. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION,PROTECTION,DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC INTEREST AND PUBLIC AMENITY IN THE AREA.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 THURLOE PLACE
LONDON
SW7 2SP
- Phone:
- 02075895543
- Email:
- sophieandreae@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window