Financial history PARISH ROOM (FARNHAM)

Charity number: 266935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £12.46k £3.97k £13.18k £6.98k £11.75k
Total expenditure £8.79k £4.06k £26.92k £6.54k £11.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A £3.99k N/A N/A