Trustees PARISH ROOM (FARNHAM)
Charity Number: 266935

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terry Williams | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Smith | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Harper | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hitchman | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Flack | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
KITTY BARRETT | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Smith | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Natsash Wainwright | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Louise Harper | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Hagan | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE ARNOLD | Trustee | 22 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ARNOLD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.