BRENT RIVER AND CANAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with local boroughs to safeguard Brent River Park and improve public access. Opposing planning applications likely to impact on the park. Arrange occasional working parties to clear undergrowth and refuse from specific areas. Help in saving and preserving buildings of character. Provide information and publicise events such as meetings and walks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Brent
- Ealing
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
- Hounslow
Governance
- 19 February 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR PHIL BELMAN | Chair |
|
||||||
Benedict Michael Morris | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eric Steven Toft | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Frederick William Templeton | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Katie Boyles | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANDREW BLACKWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.03k | £395 | £13.06k | £2.69k | £5.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.11k | £600 | £431 | £7.92k | £7.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 1973
Charitable objects
(A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE RIVER BRENT FROM HANGER LANE TO THE GREAT WEST ROAD AND ADJACENT LANDS.(B)TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE ABOVE AREA.(C)TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE ABOVE AREA.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Billets Hart Close
LONDON
W7 2PY
- Phone:
- 02085664705
- Email:
- info@brentriverpark.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window