PORTSMOUTH CHORAL UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Practises and puts on public performances of music often in collaboration with young persons/school choirs, orchestras and bands and with young soloists. Holds 'Come and Sing' events for public participation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 09 July 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sylvia Mary Lock | Chair | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Smith | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Gweirydd Griffiths | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Evelyn Chapman | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Ann Keyzor | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Sweasey | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrea Hegedus | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lois Houston | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Helen SCHOFIELD | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE HELLIWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ALISON MARGARET BARKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.67k | £31.96k | £18.36k | £27.89k | £23.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.72k | £24.05k | £51.28k | £36.60k | £33.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 June 2021 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 June 2021 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 July 2020 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 23 March 2021 | 296 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 2ND JULY 1974 AS AMENDED ON 14 OCTOBER 2003 as amended on 30 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 SECOND AVENUE
SOUTHBOURNE
EMSWORTH
PO10 8HP
- Phone:
- 01243379450
- Email:
- pcusecretary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window