THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 266982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The RNA is a rank-blind membership organisation primarily for serving and former serving RN personnel and the wider naval family, who are proud of their Naval Service. We seek to maintain the naval ethos and enjoy sharing experiences with like minded people while supporting each other in times of need. The mission of the RNA is to foster camaraderie through events, comms and welfare support.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Australia
  • Cyprus
  • France
  • Ireland
  • Isle Of Man
  • Japan
  • Malta
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland
  • South Africa
  • Spain

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 February 1974: Standard registration
  • 28 April 2014: Funds received from 1073894 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION LISS & DISTRICT BRANCH
  • 24 July 2015: Funds received from 1071317 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION HAVANT BRANCH
  • 08 January 2016: Funds received from 1071207 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION MANOR PARK BRANCH
  • 04 March 2019: Funds received from 1072494 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION HALIFAX BRANCH
  • 15 November 2021: Funds received from 1068495 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION HEREFORD BRANCH
  • 11 January 2023: Funds received from 1069176 WIGSTON & DISTRICT BRANCH ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION
  • 02 February 2024: Funds received from 1068802 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION CHESTER BRANCH
  • 14 February 2024: Funds received from 1077782 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION DRIFFIELD BRANCH
  • 16 February 2024: Funds received from 1064972 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION (DEAL & WALMER BRANCH)
  • 16 February 2024: Funds received from 1071645 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION BIRMINGHAM SHELDON BRANCH
  • 22 February 2024: Funds received from 1070953 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION BROMLEY BRANCH
  • 22 February 2024: Funds received from 1068282 THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION NUMBER 2 AREA
  • 14 March 2024: Funds received from 1068800 THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION PADDOCK WOOD BRANCH
  • 14 March 2024: Funds received from 1068800 THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION PADDOCK WOOD BRANCH
  • 09 August 2024: Funds received from 1067116 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION LUTON AND DUNSTABLE BRANCH
  • 20 November 2024: Funds received from 1067924 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA BRANC...
  • 06 December 2024: Funds received from 1076779 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION SIDCUP BRANCH
  • 06 December 2024: Funds received from 1068284 THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION MARKET HARBOROUGH BRAN...
  • 06 December 2024: Funds received from 1068284 THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION MARKET HARBOROUGH BRAN...
  • 28 April 2025: Funds received from 1072724 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION LLANELLI BRANCH
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Vice Admiral Duncan Laurence Potts CB Chair 04 September 2021
None on record
Dennis Potter Trustee 16 June 2024
CHATHAM BRANCH - ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Paul Harries Trustee 16 June 2024
None on record
Andrew Christie Trustee 04 January 2023
None on record
Stephen John Elliot Trustee 04 March 2022
None on record
Stirling Simmons Trustee 04 March 2022
None on record
Roslyn Hastie-Murray Trustee 04 March 2022
None on record
Peter James Chivers Trustee 04 March 2022
None on record
Warwick Ian Belfitt Trustee 04 March 2022
THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION LISKEARD BRANCH
Received: On time
Claire Louise Robson Trustee 09 December 2021
The Naval Children's Charity
Received: On time
Lance Higgon-Young Trustee 04 September 2021
ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION NUMBER SEVEN AREA
Received: On time
Ian Irvin Trustee 03 June 2017
None on record
Paul Stephenson Trustee 06 September 2015
None on record
James Mark Slawson OBE Trustee 21 March 2014
None on record
Mary Marguarita Lock MBE Trustee 14 March 2013
None on record
STANLEY KEITH RIDLEY MBE Trustee 21 November 2012
ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION ST NEOTS AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £365.53k £324.73k £278.24k £213.42k £762.65k
Total expenditure £518.84k £302.54k £402.18k £278.24k £718.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £708.27k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.03k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.93k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £33.41k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £233.64k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £696.26k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £22.35k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £49.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.56k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £18.54k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.40m
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £397.10k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £162.30k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 07 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Central Office
Lanyard House
Scott Road
HM Naval Base
Portsmouth
PO1 3LU
Phone:
02392722983