Trustees ZURICH COMMUNITY TRUST (UK) LIMITED
Charity number: 266983

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Collinson | Chair | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ben Skelton | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Drazen Jaksic | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Dunn | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Dunster | Trustee | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Peden | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Myslik | Trustee | 10 December 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.