THE BARLEY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To give grants for any charitable purpose for the general benefit of the inhabitants of the Parish of Westerham for which provision is not made out of rates, taxes or other public funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 03 April 1974: Standard registration
- BARLEY CHARITY TRUST (Working name)
- BARLEY CHARITY (Previous name)
- HARRY EDWARD BARLEY FOR A GARDEN OF REST (Previous name)
- HARRY EDWARD BARLEY TRUST FOR A GARDEN OF REST AT WESTERHAM (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WESTERHAM TOWN COUNCIL | Trustee | 12 December 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £848 | £876 | £887 | £782 | £737 | |
|
Total expenditure | £825 | £900 | £800 | £880 | £585 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 MAY 1949 AND SCHEME OF 7 NOVEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WESTERHAM FOR WHICH PROVISION IS NOT MADE OUT OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WESTERHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
RUSSELL HOUSE
MARKET SQUARE
WESTERHAM
KENT
TN16 1RB
- Phone:
- 01959562147
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window