Governing document FINDON VALLEY RESIDENTS' ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/01/1974 AS AMENDED ON 11/10/1988 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/1989 AS AMENDED ON 09/04/1991 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2006 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAR 2024
Charitable objects
(THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN THE AREA COMPRISING FINDON VALLEY IN THE BOROUGH OF WORTHING, WHICH AREA SHALL HEREINAFTER BE REFERRED TO AS ‘THE AREA OF BENEFIT’. A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND THE PRESERVATION OF NOTABLE ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF AREAS OF NATURAL BEAUTY OR ENVIRONMENTAL INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
FINDON VALLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.