THE GOLDHILL FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 December 1975: Standard registration
- 14 April 2011: Funds received from 328114 JACKSONS CHARITABLE TRUST
- THE GOLDHILL FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- JACK GOLDHILL CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolyn Goldhill | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|||||
JACQUELINE SARA SEGAL | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL LOUIS GOLDHILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.20k | £150.52k | £171.76k | £89.87k | £121.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.42k | £99.96k | £165.82k | £137.34k | £109.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 17TH JANUARY 1974 as amended on 09 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OR FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Xeinadin London Limited
249 Cranbrook Road
Ilford
Essex
IG1 4TG
- Phone:
- 07802871655
- Email:
- 1976JGCT@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window