Financial history ART SERVICES GRANTS LIMITED

Charity number: 267021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.20m £7.61m £4.75m £5.44m £5.40m
Total expenditure £5.09m £5.55m £5.15m £3.91m £4.83m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £287.81k £484.25k £659.15k £235.29k £269.29k
Income - Donations and legacies £259.70k £6.80k £6.66k £204.10k £1.10k
Income - Other trading activities £127.41k £1.75m £93.54k £124.22k £67.24k
Income - Charitable activities £4.80m £5.84m £4.64m £5.06m £5.10m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.79k £6.52k £4.12k £52.46k £237.09k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.01m £5.51m £5.12m £3.88m £4.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £75.93k £41.72k £26.16k £25.43k £43.39k
Expenditure - Governance £16.29k £0 £20.43k £21.52k £25.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0