GEORGE NYMPTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Administers and maintains the Village Hall as a facility for the Parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £680 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 03 March 1977: Standard registration
- GEORGENYMPTON VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Bateman | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adele Poole | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Agnes Robertson Maxwell | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven William Howe | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Addison-Wright | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.24k | £11.98k | £21.47k | £9.93k | £12.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.28k | £2.60k | £31.12k | £9.07k | £6.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £10.50k | £18.26k | N/A | £680 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 24 JANUARY 1977
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GEORGENYMPTON AND QUEENSNYMPTON IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF GEORGE NYMPTON AND QUEENS NYMPTON
Linked charities
- 03 March 1977 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Englefield
George Nympton
SOUTH MOLTON
EX36 4JE
- Phone:
- 01769572116
- Email:
- gnvillagehall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window