THE OXFORD SYNAGOGUE AND JEWISH CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objectives are to make the premises owned by the charity available for Jewish religious and cultural activities and to promote charitable work on behalf of the students and wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 09 April 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Alan Ryde | Chair |
|
||||||
Jake Marcus Berger | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Saul Rose | Trustee | 20 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benedict Mark Leycester Simon | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Dangoor | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|||||
David Silver | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Shatz | Trustee | 03 June 2018 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ALAN LESLIE STEIN | Trustee | 03 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
SALLY SHENA VAN NOORDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.65k | £249.34k | £216.34k | £216.34k | £257.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.03k | £319.25k | £204.33k | £204.33k | £268.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.39k | £16.98k | £346 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED THE 9TH JANUARY 1974
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENTS OF THE JEWISH RELIGION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY, CUSTOMS, LANGUAGE, TENETS AND CULTURE HOWSOEVER OF THE CONCERNING THE JEWISH FAITH AND ITS PEOPLE, AND IN PARTICULAR AND WITH A VIEW THERETO THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE IN OXFORD OF A SYNAGOGUE AND CENTRE THERETO ADJACENT (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CHARITABLE PREMISES") WHEREIN TO WORSHIP ACCORDING TO THE RITES AND USAGES OF THE JEWISH RELIGION AND OTHERWISE FOR USE IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oxford Jewish Congregation
21 Richmond Road
OXFORD
OX1 2JL
- Phone:
- 01865514356
- Email:
- osjc@ojc-online.org
- Website:
-
ojc-online.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window