THE DAVID HOUSE FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity Trust has transferred all of it's activities to a new charity (CIO) - See charity 1155973 The David House
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 March 1974: Standard registration
- THE DAVID HOUSE FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- MEDIASERVE INCORPORATING THE DAVID HOUSE FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- THE DAVID HOUSE FELLOWSHIP INCORPORATING THE DAVID PRESS (Previous name)
- THE UNITED KINGDOM TRUST FOR JEWISH EVANGELICAL WITNESS (Previous name)
- THE UNITED KINGDOM TRUST FOR THE JEWISH EVANGELICAL WITNESS INCORPORATING THE DAVID PRESS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISTAIR SCOTT | Trustee |
|
||||||
DES STARRITT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CONSTANCE SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12/02/1974 AS AMENDED ON 20/01/1977 AS AMENDED ON 06/01/1981 AS AMENDED ON 09/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2010 AS AMENDED ON 15/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS EXPRESSED IN THE BIBLE, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG JEWS.
Area of benefit
UK AND THE REST OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Blackworth Court
Highworth
Swindon
Wilts
SN6 7NS
- Phone:
- 01793862147
- Email:
- info@thedavidhouse.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window