Governing document THE DAVID HOUSE FELLOWSHIP

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12/02/1974 AS AMENDED ON 20/01/1977 AS AMENDED ON 06/01/1981 AS AMENDED ON 09/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2010 AS AMENDED ON 15/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS EXPRESSED IN THE BIBLE, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG JEWS.
Area of benefit
UK AND THE REST OF THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.