1ST HUNGERFORD SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Scout group offers 1 beaver colony, 1 cub pack & 1 scout pack.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 26 March 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Farrant | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Richard Lambourn | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT STROUD | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
LINDSEY FRASER | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Head | Trustee | 28 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Lambourn | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE LAMBOURN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.27k | £26.92k | £12.17k | £8.82k | £10.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.54k | £8.54k | £25.25k | £11.28k | £12.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.81k | £8.75k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
HUNGERFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 WESTBROOK CLOSE
HUNGERFORD
RG17 0HU
- Phone:
- 01488683023
- Email:
- stephanielambourn@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window