Governing document TONY RAMPTON TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH FEBRUARY 1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21ST MAY 1981, 31 OCTOBER 1995, 31 JULY 2001 AND 8 NOVEMBER 2001 as amended on 27 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 To advance all or any of the purposes that are recognised as charitable by English law and, without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing, to grant gratuities, pensions or allowances to persons who are or shall be necessitous and who for the time being are or have been in the employ of Freemans Public Limited Company or of any other company to which upon any reconstruction or amalgamation the goodwill undertaking and assets of Freemans Public Limited Company may be transferred or of any subsidiary (as defined by Section 1159 of the Companies Act 2006) for the time being of Freemans Public Limited Company (?Freemans?) or of any other company and the wives, widows, husbands, widowers, children, parents and other needy dependants of any person who for the time being is or would if living have been himself or herself a member of the class of beneficiaries. 3.2 Nothing in these Articles shall authorise an application of the property of the Charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005 and/or section 2 of the Charities Act (Northern Ireland) 2008.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.