Accounts and annual returns THE MICHAEL GODDARD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 267112
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2014 18 April 2015 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2013 29 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 Not Required