BRITISH MAHABODHI SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 March 1974: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 February 2009: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JANUARY 1974
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE TEACHING OF THE BUDDHA (BUDDHA-DHAMMA) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF AN ESTABLISHMENT AS A RESIDENTIAL CENTRE FOR BHIKKHUS (MONKS) AND SUCH OTHER PERSONS AS MAY BE DESIGNATED BY THE SANGHA (COMMUNITY OF MONKS) WHO HAVE UNDERTAKEN THE RULES OF TRAINING (SIKKHAPADAS) AND, WHERE POSSIBLE, TO MAINTAIN AND SUPPORT AGED AND NECESSITIOUS FOLLOWERS OF THE BUDDHADAMMA. 2. TO PROMOTE, FURTHER AND ASSIST WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM THE STUDY AND TEACHING OF BUDDHIST THOUGHT. 3. TO ASSIST AND CO-OPERATE WITH OTHER BUDDHIST ORGANISATIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDON SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF ARTICLE (4). 4. TO ENGAGE IN ANY OTHER ACTIVITY WHICH IS ANCILLARY AND INCIDENTAL TO ANY OF THE FOREGOING OBJECTS PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT NOTHING HEREIN CONTAINED SHALL BE CONSTRUED AS AUTHORISING ANY ACTIVITY OR APPLICATION OF THE SOCIETY'S PROPERTY THAT IS NOT LEGALLY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window