THE WALTON-ON-THE-HILL (SURREY) ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association provides within its premises (the Breech Lane Community Centre) low cost accommodation for local groups' regular and occasional use thereby providing opportunities for local residents to meet together and share common interests. It is a popular venue for children's parties, the meeting place of the Village Forum and is the local Polling Station.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 22 April 1974: Standard registration
- THE BREECH LANE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEBORAH CASTLE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gesina Julliette Kula | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUZANNE JANE MARSHALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.71k | £22.26k | £22.74k | £23.91k | £32.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.00k | £16.83k | £22.36k | £23.96k | £28.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2ND AUGUST 1973 AND AMENDED 6TH FEBRUARY 1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR A CHURCH HALL, SUNDAY SCHOOL, ADULT SCHOOL AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION OR EDUCATION AND ALSO FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1958 WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE RESIDENTS OF WALTON-ON-THE-HILL AFORESAID AND NEIGHBOURING COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
WALTON-ON-THE-HILL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sandy Lane Cottage
Sandy Lane
MIDHURST
West Sussex
GU29 9RH
- Phone:
- 01737812636
- Email:
- mike@mdg-ltd.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window