REDBOURN MISSIONARY TRUST

Charity Number: 267130
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust owns and manages 10 properties let to missionaries on leave or during periods of study and to retired missionaries.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015

Total income: £51,529
Total expenditure: £57,134

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 March 1967: Standard registration
  • 04 April 2014: Funds received from 251960 THE REDBOURN MISSIONARY TRUST
  • 10 June 2016: Funds transferred to 1045920 PILGRIMS' FRIEND SOCIETY
  • 10 June 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE REDBOURN MISSIONARY HOUSING (1974) TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £47.82k £43.79k £47.41k £100.98k £51.53k
Total expenditure £43.99k £50.27k £42.79k £50.27k £57.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 24 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 24 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 17 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 17 December 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 22 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 22 October 2013 On Time