LAWRENCE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help and educate boys and girls through their leisure time and activities so to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Hampshire
Governance
- 27 March 1974: Standard registration
- THE LAWRENCE BOYS CLUB (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIFF KENT | Trustee | 03 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.02k | £13.18k | £26.31k | £25.67k | £24.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.49k | £8.64k | £13.57k | £15.92k | £14.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 04 December 2024 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 04 December 2024 | 279 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 13 June 2023 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 13 June 2023 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 20 April 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND FEBRUARY 1974 AS AMENDED 2 JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE CLUB IS TO HELP AND EDUCATEBOYS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SCOEITY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marsh Lane
Lymington
Hampshire
SO41 9BX
- Phone:
- 07836503475
- Email:
- alan@alanfarrar.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window