THE WENDOVER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making to charitable institutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 1974: Standard registration
- THE EDGAR ASTAIRE AND SONS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER KRAVITZ | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY DAVID KERMAN | Trustee | 18 August 2015 |
|
|||||
Mark David Astaire | Trustee | 18 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43 | £29.14k | £28.74k | £49 | £49 | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.36k | £76.27k | £42.68k | £99.34k | £99.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 23 February 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 April 2021 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH MARCH 1974 AS AMENDED ON 20 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 PRINTING HOUSE YARD
LONDON
E2 7PR
- Phone:
- 02077398790
- Email:
- enquiries@leonardjones.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window