Financial history SEA PALLING INDEPENDENT LIFEBOAT LTD

Charity number: 267211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £44.21k £112.19k £44.70k £60.73k £283.37k
Total expenditure £39.31k £36.11k £47.44k £53.44k £48.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.21k £20.00k N/A £17.00k N/A