Financial history ST ANDREW’S CHURCH HINGHAM CHARITY

Charity number: 267241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £40.44k £46.45k £47.51k £79.16k £95.46k
Total expenditure £47.37k £41.31k £60.72k £41.31k £91.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A