NORTH DEVON MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Museum mainly of local maritime matters but also agricultural and social activities as well. A Victorian school is run for local schools to use to give them an idea of educational ways in Victorian times. The catchment area is North Devon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 06 May 1974: Standard registration
- NORTH DEVON MARITIME MUSEUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Preece | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
BARRY MORTIMER EDWARDS | Trustee | 11 December 2012 |
|
|||||
MR P CHRISTIE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.88k | £31.51k | £21.05k | £29.13k | £34.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.71k | £7.59k | £16.64k | £37.40k | £57.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £3.09k | £4.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £300 | £27.40k | £350 | £200 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH MARCH 1974
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR:- A. THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A REGIONAL MUSEUM ILLUSTRATIVE OF THE CHARACTER AND HISTORY OF THE AREA TRADITIONALLY KNOWN AS NORTH DEVON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THAT AREA AND ITS VISITOR. B. THE ACQUISITION OF SUITABLE REGIONAL MATERIAL AND ITS PROPER CONSERVATION FOR THE PURPOSES OF EDUCATIONAL PRESERVATION DISPLAY AND RESEARCH. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH MARCH 1974).
Area of benefit
NORTH DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTH DEVON MARITIME MUSEUM
ODUN ROAD
APPLEDORE
BIDEFORD
EX39 1PT
- Phone:
- 01237422064
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window