HINDU SWAYAMSEVAK SANGH (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To set up branches where Hindus of the UK could congregate, provide facilities for training of mind and body and develop good character, organise leadership courses, arrange for lectures discussions not only by members of the charity but also by inviting eminent persons from within and outside the UK. To start specific projects to promote and achieve the aims and objects of the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,154 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 April 1974: Standard registration
- 12 January 2016: Funds received from 1112205 AAPNEE CONFEDERATION OF INDIAN COMMUNITIES (MANCHE...
- HINDU SWAYAMSEVAK SANGH UK (Working name)
- HINDU SWAYAMSEVAK SANGH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR DHIRAJ D SHAH | Trustee |
|
||||||
DHIRAJLAL M SHAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMRAT CHANDEGRA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £362.20k | £258.46k | £309.79k | £406.46k | £481.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £317.79k | £149.60k | £232.75k | £397.09k | £460.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.00k | £14.00k | £9.00k | £9.95k | £11.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4TH MARCH 1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25TH NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE HINDU RELIGION AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HINDU IDEALS AND WAY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
46-48 Loughborough Road
Leicester
LE4 5LD
- Phone:
- 07768722057
- Email:
- info@hssuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window