BARON CARLETON LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to other registered charities from funds collected from members of masonic lodge meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 October 1974: Standard registration
- 09 October 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £521 | £449 | £3.83k | £3.69k | £4.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £613 | £481 | £4.06k | £3.71k | £3.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | 06 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | 06 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BY-LAWS DATED 16TH APRIL 1973
Charitable objects
THE ASSISTANCE OF INDIGENT BRETHREN OF THE THE LODGE, THE WIDOWS OR ORPHANS OF FORMER MEMBERS, THE SUPPORT OF THE ROYAL MASONIC INSTITUTIONS AND THE ROYAL MASONIC HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window