Financial history The Worshipful Company of Turners Charitable Trust

Charity number: 267372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £66.39k £65.37k £41.52k £148.85k £80.39k
Total expenditure £57.44k £63.71k £45.93k £99.54k £93.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A