THE BRITISH ORTHODOX CHURCH (METROPOLIS OF GLASTONBURY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support to British Orthodox parishes and local clergy; support to other Orthodox communities in the UK & overseas; counselling and pastoral care to individuals; provision of information through publications and websites; education and study of the history, doctrines and worship of Oriental Orthodox Christianity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 May 1974: Standard registration
- 12 February 2016: Funds received from 1109950 BRITISH ORTHODOX TRUST
- BRITISH ORTHODOX CHURCH (Working name)
- THE BRITISH ORTHODOX CHURCH (Previous name)
- THE BRITISH ORTHODOX CHURCH OF THE BRITISH ISLES (Previous name)
- THE CATHOLIC APOSTOLIC CHURCH (METROPOLIS OF GLASTONBURY) (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev William Henry Hugo Newman-Norton | Chair | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Trevor Ian Maskery | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.02k | £5.08k | £23.16k | £6.87k | £5.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.13k | £4.23k | £17.10k | £9.19k | £9.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/03/1974 AS AMENDED ON 01/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 04/10/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 HEATHWOOD GARDENS
LONDON
SE7 8EP
- Phone:
- 02088543090
- Email:
- info@britishorthodox.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window