THE PEMBRIDGE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING IN THE PEMBRIDGE CONSERVATION AREA 2. TO STIMULATE AND PROMOTE PUBLIC INTEREST AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE NEIGHBOURHOOD 3. TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORIC INTEREST WITHIN OF AFFECTING THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 20 May 1974: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mx Joanne Share-Bernia | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mx Susan Burden | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Thompson | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Pilkington | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Mead | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Fleming-Brown | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.79k | £2.66k | £2.38k | £3.56k | £5.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £841 | £2.37k | £1.36k | £942 | £5.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2024 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH DECEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 FEB 2017 as amended on 07 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
(A) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC INTEREST OR GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY WITHIN OR AFFECTING THE NEIGHBOURHOOD. (B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING WITHIN THE PEMBRIDGE CONSERVATION AREA. (C) TO STIMULATE AND PROMOTE PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
PEMBRIDGE CONSERVATION AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Viscount Court
1 Pembridge Villas
LONDON
W2 4XA
- Phone:
- 07970141770
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window