THE SCIENTIFIC EXPLORATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes, organises and supports expeditions for the exploration of developing regions of the world for the purpose of advancing knowledge of, or research into, or for the purpose of educating individuals in the geography, history, archaeology, sociology, economics, ecology and geology of their regions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bolivia
- Chile
- Ecuador
- Ethiopia
- Guyana
- India
- Madagascar
- Malaysia
- Mongolia
- Nepal
- Peru
- Romania
- Zambia
Governance
- 26 April 1974: Standard registration
- SES (Working name)
- THE SCIENTIFIC EXPLORATION SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Felix CBE | Chair | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY PETER FISH | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|||||
David Zeitlin | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Briony Deborah Turner | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Moss | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Diane Allen OBE | Trustee | 22 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JEFFREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.16k | £46.89k | £95.72k | £147.77k | £137.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.48k | £67.22k | £123.53k | £118.16k | £133.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH NOVEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED 19 APRIL 1998, 30 APRIL 2003 AND 27 APRIL 2005. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/03/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ORGANISE OR SUPPORT (WHETHER FINANCIALLY OR OTHERWISE) EXPEDITIONS FOR THE EXPLORATION OF THE UNDER-DEVELOPED REGIONS OF THE EARTH FOR THE PURPOSE OF ADVANCING KNOWLEDGE OF, OR RESEARCH INTO, OR FOR THE PURPOSE OF EDUCATING INDIVIDUALS IN, THE GEOGRAPHY, GEODESY GEOPHYSICS, HISTORY, ARCHAEOLOGY, SOCIOLOGY AND ECONOMICS TOGETHER WITH THE TOPOGRAPHY, ECOLOGY, METEOROLOGY, BOTANY, ZOOLOGY, HUMAN PHYSIOLOGY AND GLACIOLOGY OF THE SAID REGIONS AND ALLIED SUBJECTS RELATING THERETO AND, WHERE INCIDENTAL TO SUCH EXPEDITIONS, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE THE POVERTY AND SICKNESS OF THE PEOPLE IN SUCH REGIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mullins Mead
Donhead St. Mary
SHAFTESBURY
SP7 9DS
- Phone:
- 01747 853353
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window