THE AMATEUR ENTOMOLOGISTS' SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the charity is to promote the study of entomology amongst amateurs, including in particular young people, by publishing books and periodicals and organising educational and other events. This includes involvement with invertebrate conservation matters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 January 1975: Standard registration
- THE A E S BUG CLUB (Working name)
- THE AES (Working name)
- THE AES BUG CLUB (Working name)
- THE BUG CLUB (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. Edgar Clive Turner | Chair | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher John Hamilton | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sophia Katarina Reinisch | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Michael John Noble | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Joseph Gillson | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Philip Reynolds | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas Robert Wadham | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Beulah Hannah Garner | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr ERICA MCALISTER | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Andy Chick | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Hugh Brown | Trustee | 03 October 2015 |
|
|||||||
Dr VICTORIA JANE BURTON | Trustee | 27 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
RALPH NICHOLAS HOBBS | Trustee | 25 April 2013 |
|
|||||||
DAFYDD VAUGHAN LEWIS | Trustee | 12 March 2005 |
|
|||||||
JACQUELINE MARY RUFFLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
COLIN HART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER JOHN HODGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.30k | £39.65k | £41.55k | £54.10k | £50.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.62k | £38.63k | £48.65k | £53.49k | £64.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MAR 1974 AS AMENDED ON 28 SEP 1974 AS AMENDED ON 25 APR 1992 AS AMENDED ON 26 APR 2003 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2019 as amended on 25 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND DISSEMINATION OF ENTOMOLOGICAL KNOWLEDGE BY EVERY MEANS POSSIBLE AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT AMONG THE YOUNGER GENERATION OF AN INTEREST IN ENTOMOLOGY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 8774
LONDON
SW7 5ZG
- Phone:
- 07733444731
- Email:
- contact@amentsoc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window