PRIVETT VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees manage and maintain Privett Village Hall for the benefit of the local community. They organise several events each year which enable villagers to meet socially in this scattered rural area. The hall is also let to a nursery school and provides a venue for other local associations to meet such as the Horticultural Society and regular sporting activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £340 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 23 May 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Baldock | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marie Daniels | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Raphael | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Wright | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Martin | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hollis | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Chung | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Flack | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Edward Sadler | Trustee | 04 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL IAN HUGHES | Trustee | 11 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.45k | £16.18k | £10.01k | £13.84k | £18.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.59k | £6.32k | £7.90k | £13.19k | £13.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £365 | £700 | £340 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 February 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 27TH FEBRUARY 1974
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF PRIVETT IN THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PRIVETT
Contact information
- Address:
-
FILMORE HILL FARMHOUSE
FILMORE HILL
PRIVETT
ALTON
GU34 3NX
- Phone:
- 01730828170
- Email:
- privettvhall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window