Accounts and annual returns THE WAKEHAM TRUST

Charity number: 267495
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 02 May 2025 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 02 May 2025 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 01 May 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required