EAST HANNINGFIELD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Preschool for children aged 2-5 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 30 May 1974: Standard registration
- 08 September 2022: Funds received from 1027824 RETTENDON PRESCHOOL
- EAST HANNINGFIELD PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- EAST HANNINGFIELD PLAY GROUP ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ricardo Horta | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Kingcott | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ana Cristina Da Sila Freire Horta | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Pleasant | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Morris | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Hampel | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Batt | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Houghton | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Phillips | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.63k | £78.93k | £68.76k | £95.82k | £53.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.33k | £61.49k | £78.29k | £80.46k | £64.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £54.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 APRIL 1970 AS AMENDED 2 OCTOBER 1985 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 2010. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 11 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
EAST HANNINGFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
East Hanningfield Preschool
c/o The Post Office
The Tye
East Hanningfield
CHELMSFORD
- Phone:
- 07732951613
- Email:
- ehps1@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window