Governing document THE CASE CENTRE LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/08/1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/06/1974 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/07/2013 as amended on 21 Sep 2023as amended on 04 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
4. The objects for which the Association is established are to advance the education of the public by the promotion support and undertaking of research in education and in particular education in business and commercial matters (including the management and good governance of businesses and public entities) and economics and psychology and kindred subjects and by the collection and provision of records and accounts of real or imaginary situations and occurrences in the above fields and generally to carry out research into educational projects and the collection of educational matter and to make available to educators the results of that research and collection and as ancillary to the foregoing educational objects (but not otherwise):- (A) To purchase, acquire and obtain interests in the copyrights of and to publish, print and make pamphlets, books, articles, images, recordings, broadcasts and films, in any format or media whatever and whether now known or developed in future, which can be used or adapted for the objects of the Association.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.