Financial history SENNEN OLD FOLKS COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 267527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £4.03k £4.11k £4.32k £4.27k £4.31k
Total expenditure £8.35k £1.99k £2.80k £3.60k £2.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A