CASSEL HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 03 July 1974: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Miles | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Murray | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Janice Denton | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zena Miles | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Turner | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Sheppard | Trustee | 16 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW McKENNA | Trustee | 02 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE MARCIA GOODWIN | Trustee | 15 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN NEIL PATMORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.23k | £41.31k | £27.60k | £24.17k | £20.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.68k | £38.06k | £12.57k | £27.92k | £19.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.65k | £20.31k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH JULY 1970
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LILLEY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RELIGIOUS OR POLITICAL OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISUR-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LILLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Street
Lilley
LUTON
LU2 8LH
- Phone:
- 01462769021
- Email:
- dzmiles12@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window