Financial history THE BRITISH COAL UTILISATION RESEARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 267559
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £71.23k £30.25k £8.67k £0 £0
Total expenditure £204.16k £119.71k £38.37k £1.47k £3.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A