Governing document THE BRITISH COAL UTILISATION RESEARCH ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 APRIL 1938 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3 JUNE 1976 24 OCTOBER 1994, 1 MARCH 1995 AND 14 AUGUST 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RESEARCH AND OTHER SCIENTIFIC STUDIES IN CONNECTION WITH (A) THE PRODUCTION , DISTRIBUTION AND UTILISATION OF COAL AND ITS DERIVATIVES AND INDUSTRIES AND TRADES ALLIED THEREWITH OR ACCESSORY THERETO, AND (B) THE MINIMISATION OF WASTE ARISING FROM THE UTILISATION OF COAL, THE POLLUTION AND HARM CAUSED BY SUCH WASTE AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PRODUCTS FROM SUCH WASTE; AND TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR SUCH WORK AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, AND TO MAKE GRANTS TO ANY PERSON OR PERSONS ENGAGED IN OR IN CONNECTION WITH RESEARCH WORK AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.