Financial history D D MCPHAIL CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 267588
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £452.81k £364.52k £129.11k £153.03k £0
Total expenditure £540.77k £341.95k £395.28k £440.77k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A