Accounts and annual returns BRAINTREE AND BOCKING CIVIC SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 267607
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2017 06 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 21 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2015 09 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2015 Not Required