Financial history BRAINTREE AND BOCKING CIVIC SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity Number: 267607
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2013 31/01/2014 31/01/2015 31/01/2016 31/01/2017
Total gross income £4.05k £3.56k £3.37k £3.29k £13.73k
Total expenditure £3.05k £1.26k £2.50k £748 £2.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0