THE FOUR LANES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES SUPPORT FOR GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS ACTIVE IN THE FIELDS OF EDUCATION, THE ARTS AND COMMUNITY IN BASINGSTOKE AND THE LOCAL AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 14 June 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Hugh Breuning | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Arabella Davies | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr AMANDA BRITTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
THE HONOURABLE DWIGHT WILLIAM MAKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.94k | £47.02k | £105.46k | £33.19k | £37.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.64k | £59.98k | £51.90k | £53.62k | £48.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST MAY 1974
Charitable objects
(A) ADVANCING EDUCATION (INCLUDING EDUCATION IN THE ARTS) AMONGST THE INHABITANTS. (B) PROMOTING THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS (IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT, 1958) WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
217 Old Worting Road
BASINGSTOKE
Hampshire
RG22 6NS
- Phone:
- 01256334417
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window