THE RANMORE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees make grants to worthy causes in accordance with the trust deed. The principal object of the charity is to provide for the needs of poor and old people, as extended by the general charitable objective contained in the trust deed. A number of projects are being considered and the trustees are looking to adopt an individualistic approach to future developments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
- Surrey
Governance
- 25 March 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Louise Bywaters | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Arthur Ireland | Trustee | 29 November 2012 |
|
|||||
HOLLIE STEPHANIE GATLAND | Trustee | 29 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MARY NUCKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY IRENE WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.32k | £17.66k | £17.45k | £19.00k | £25.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.06k | £66.01k | £66.01k | £73.01k | £57.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH MARCH 1974
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR SUCH CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Atlanta Trust Ltd
615-623 Princes Road
DARTFORD
DA2 6HH
- Phone:
- 01322287181
- Email:
- mary@atlantatrust.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window