Accounts and annual returns ROBERT C COUNSELL MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 267632
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 14 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 23 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 20 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required