THE FRIENDS OF JEWISH SERVICEMEN AND WOMEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 June 1974: Standard registration
- 09 June 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 March 2013: Re-registered
- FRIENDS OF JEWISH SERVICEMEN (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louis Trup | Chair | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynette Judaea Schoen Nusbacher | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Commander Daniel Gerald Weil | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ASHLEY CHARLES SWEETLAND | Trustee | 22 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Major DANNY SHARPE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.77k | £12.96k | £4.51k | £1.60k | £9.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.60k | £6.91k | £6.04k | £6.19k | £6.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND MARCH 1956 AS AMENDED 29 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
MINISTERING TO THE RELIGIOUS NEEDS AND PROMOTING THE FURTHER RELIGIOUS EDUCATION OF JEWISH PERSONNEL SERVING IN HM FORCES, AND FULFILLING SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH SUCH PERSONNEL AS THE FORCES COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME UNDERTAKE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Rutherford Way
Bushey Heath
Bushey
WD23 1NJ
- Phone:
- 07890847631
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window