Accounts and annual returns THE VILLAGE HALL EAST AND BOTOLPH CLAYDON

Charity number: 267787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 February 2022 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 February 2022 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 February 2022 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required