Financial history THE VILLAGE HALL EAST AND BOTOLPH CLAYDON

Charity number: 267787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.85k £30.92k £15.78k £29.11k £28.86k
Total expenditure £11.95k £16.18k £26.10k £21.83k £19.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.77k N/A £3.41k £8.50k